Vornes v. Ellis et al

Plaintiff: Terrick A Vornes
Defendant: Chris Ellis, Jennifer Ephellin and Ray Rigsby
Case Number: 3:2010cv00240
Filed: September 29, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER assessing an initial partial filing fee of $35 and directing the Mississippi County Sherriff or his designee to collect the amount from Plaintiff's prison trust account and forward it to the Clerk of the Court. Thereafter, the Sheriff or his designee shall collect the remaining $420 balance in monthly payments of an amount equal to twenty percent from Plaintiff's prison trust account each time the amount in the account exceeds $10. The Clerk if the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Mississippi County Sheriff. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 03/06/2013. (jak)
November 10, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 8 Order entered this date, this case is dismissed without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. The Court further certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the Order & Judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous & not in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/10/2010. (jct)
October 5, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to forward an in forma pauperis application to Plaintiff. Plaintiff is directed to submit, no later than 30 days after entry of this Order, either the $350 statutory filing fee, or to complete & sign the in forma pauperis application & file it. Plaintiff's failure to do so will result in the dismissal of his complaint. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/5/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vornes v. Ellis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrick A Vornes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Ephellin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Rigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?