Guy et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Adrian Guy, Gabrielle Guy and Estella Guy
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Wells Fargo Auto Finance LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv00255
Filed: October 20, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss.The Court notes that Plaintiffs' right to re-file the case against Defendant is subject to the provisions of Rule 41(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Under Rule 41(d), the Plaintiffs may be ordered to pay any costs of this action which the Court deems appropriate upon filing the same claim against the same defendant. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 09/25/2012. (jak)
March 31, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/31/2011. (jct)
January 11, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 20 Answer to Complaint, directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to indicate Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as the correctly named defendant. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/11/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guy et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Guy
Represented By: Lawrence W. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Guy
Represented By: Lawrence W. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estella Guy
Represented By: Lawrence W. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: James W. Tilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Auto Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?