Richman v. 1720 Entertainment LLC et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Richman
Defendant: 1720 Entertainment LLC and Does
Case Number: 3:2010cv00256
Filed: October 21, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Joseph Richman against 1720 Entertainment LLC for $25,000.00; postjudgment interest shall accrue at 0.12% per annum from today's date until the judgment is paid; all claims against the Doe defts are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/2/11. (vjt)
November 30, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff's claims against Doe Companies & John Doe Individuals 1 through 10. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/30/2011. (jct)
August 25, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Second Motion for Entry of Default. Joseph Richman is awarded $25,000.00 damages, the amount of his losses, from Defendant 1720 Entertainment LLC. Richman must either move to dismiss the Doe Defendants without prejudice or file a proposed amended complaint naming them by 10/15/11. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/25/2011. (jct)
July 28, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 9 Second MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment filed by Joseph Richman, (Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/23/2011 at 1:00 PM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr., Witness List & Exhibit List due by 8/10/2011). The Court directs that Richman send 1720 Entertainment's lawyer a copy of this Order by certified mail receipt required & file proof of service by 8/10/11. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/28/2011. (jct)
March 28, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 3 MOTION for Default Judgment against 1720 Entertainment LLC filed by Joseph Richman. The Court vacates, for good cause, 6 Clerk's Default. Plaintiff's time to serve the suit is reopened until 5/31/2011. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/28/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richman v. 1720 Entertainment LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Richman
Represented By: Gerald A. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1720 Entertainment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?