Ashley v. Milligan

Plaintiff: Jimmy Ashley
Defendant: Florine Tousant Milligan
Case Number: 3:2010cv00259
Filed: October 25, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12131
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER/ORDER directing Mr. Mayfield to respond to 28 Supplemental Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 04/03/2013. (jak)
March 4, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT DECREE signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 03/04/2013. (jak)
December 14, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the parties' request per 22 Notice of Settlement to waive the deadlines including the trial date set by 21 Amended Final Scheduling Order. The Parties are directed to file their consent decree by 5:00 p.m. Friday, February 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/14/2012. (jak)
July 6, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 8 Answer, directing the Clerk to substitute Howard Slinkard for Florine Tousant Milligan on the docket. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/6/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashley v. Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Ashley
Represented By: Edward I. Zwilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florine Tousant Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?