Elliott v. Ellis et al

Plaintiff: Dewayne Elliott
Defendant: Christopher Ellis, Mike Bingham, John Weldon, Nancy Hall and Kerry Clark
Case Number: 3:2010cv00267
Filed: October 26, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 34 Order, Judgment is entered dismissing this case with prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/14/2013. (jak)
September 16, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 27 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's 25 Motion to Continue with his lawsuit is granted. Defendants' 22 Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/16/2013. (jak)
August 9, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER inviting Plaintiff Elliott to submit a response by August 29, 2013, to Defendants' 22 Motion to Dismiss. If he elects to file a response, he shall show cause why his complaint should not be dismissed for his failure to comply with Local Rules 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 8/9/2013. (jak)
December 2, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Kerry Clark and Nancy Hall WITH PREJUDICE, & they are removed as party Defendants. The Clerk of the court is directed to stay & administratively terminate this proceeding pending final disposition of Plaintiff's criminal charges. This case is subject to reopening upon Plaintiff's filing of a motion to reopen the case after such final disposition. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/2/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. Ellis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewayne Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?