Heard v. Blytheville Arkansas, City of et al

Plaintiff: Louise Heard
Defendant: Blytheville Arkansas, City of, Blytheville Police Department, Ross A Thompson, James Sanders and Does
Case Number: 3:2010cv00272
Filed: November 1, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, consistent with 39 Order entered this date, this case is hereby DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/6/2012. (jct)
January 9, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing the Doe defendants without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/9/12. (vjt)
December 21, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER advising that Plaintiff will have 14 days from the entry of this Order to show cause why the Court should not dismiss the Doe defendants, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/21/2011. (jct)
December 16, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rescheduling case for a jury trial beginning on March 5, 2012, at 9:30 a.m. in Jonesboro, Arkansas. Counsel should be present at 9:00 a.m. for pretrial matters; discovery and motions ddls have expired. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/16/11. (kpr)
November 3, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rescheduling Jury Trial for 6/25/2012 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Susan Webber Wright. Counsel should be present at 9:00AM for pretrial matters. All deadlines for discovery & motions have expired, with other deadlines to remain consistent with the new trial setting. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/3/2011. (jct)
May 2, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion to Dismiss filed by the City of Blytheville & Ross A. Thompson. Plaintiff's claims against these defendants are dismissed. Plaintiff names the Blytheville Police Department as a defendant. Municipal police departments are not legal entities subject to suit, & Plaintiff's claims against the Blytheville Police Department are dismissed. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/2/2011. (jct)
December 1, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 MOTION to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading. Blytheville Arkansas, City of, Blytheville Police Department & Ross A Thompson's answer or responsive pleading deadline is extended up to & including 12/15/2010. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/1/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heard v. Blytheville Arkansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Heard
Represented By: Jimmie L. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blytheville Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blytheville Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross A Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?