Haggans v. Ford of West Memphis

Plaintiff: Robert Haggans
Defendant: Ford of West Memphis
Case Number: 3:2010cv00279
Filed: November 3, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 15 Order entered on this date, this case be, and it hereby is, dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/15/2011. (jct)
November 22, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER advising Plaintiff of his responsibility to be familiar & comply with all the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as well as the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to so comply can result in dismissal of Plaintiff's claim. The Clerk is directed to serve this Order on Plaintiff by both regular & certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/22/2010. (jct)
November 3, 2010 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER provisionally granting 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert Haggans. Signed at the Direction of the Court by Jean Turman on 11/3/2010. (jct) (copy handed to plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haggans v. Ford of West Memphis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Haggans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford of West Memphis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?