Thrasher v. Bryan et al

Plaintiff: Dennis Thrasher
Defendant: Michael Bryan, Johnson and Ronald Beck
Case Number: 3:2010cv00298
Filed: November 23, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 55 Order. It is hereby considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/20/2012. (jak)
April 12, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Attorney Matthew C. Hutsell to represent Defendant Michael Bryan in all further proceedings in this case. The Clerk is directed to send Mr. Hutsell & Mr. Bryan a copy of this Order. Counsel may access the file from CM/ECF. Counsel must make written application to withdraw within 21 days of the date of this Order, if there is cause to withdraw; otherwise, the appointment will be effective. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/12/2012. (jct)
April 10, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, in conformity with Rule 83.7 of the Local Rules, Attorney Kathryn A. Pryor is hereby appointed to represent Plaintiff Dennis Thrasher in all further proceedings in this case. The Clerk is directed to send Ms. Pryor a copy of this Order & Loca l Rule 83.7, & send a copy of this Order to Mr. Thrasher. Counsel must make written application to withdraw within 21 days of the date of this Order, if there is cause to withdraw; otherwise, the appointment will be effective. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/10/2012. (jct)
December 21, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/21/2011. (jct)
July 27, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; denying 32 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/27/2011. (jct)
July 11, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Mr. Thrasher to inform the Court, w/i 30 days of the entry of this Order, of his new address. He is also ordered to submit a new request to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the remaining filing fee to the Court. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/11/2011. (jct)
February 17, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to reissue summons for Defendant Bryan, & the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copy of the Complaint 2 & summons upon Defendant Bryan at the address provided under seal, without prepayment of fees & costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/17/2011. (jct)
December 30, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 5 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Beth Deere in its entirety. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Johnson & Beck are DISMISSED without prejudice. In addition, Plaintiff's claim for money damages against Defendant Bryan in his official capacity is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/30/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thrasher v. Bryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Thrasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?