Johnson v. Viskase

Plaintiff: Noah Johnson, Jr
Defendant: Viskase
Case Number: 3:2010cv00304
Filed: December 1, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing this case with prejudice pursuant to 20 Memorandum and Order entered this date. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/27/2011. (jct)
July 25, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons & complaint on the defendant in this action. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/25/2011. (jct)
December 1, 2010 2 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S ORDER, pursuant to General Order No. 29, provisionally approving 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Noah Johnson, Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court by Jean Turman on 12/1/2010. (jct) (copy handed to plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Viskase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viskase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?