Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Osceola Nursing Home LLP

Petitioner: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Respondent: Osceola Nursing Home LLP
Case Number: 3:2010mc00004
Filed: November 18, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 MOTION for Reconsideration re 19 Order, filed by Osceola Nursing Home LLP. The Court vacates that part of 19 Order awarding the attorney's fee. Respondent has complied with the remainder of that Order. This matter is concluded, & the Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/15/2011. (jct)
March 9, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to the Evidentiary Hearing held 3/8/11, the Court orders Respondent Osceola Nursing Home LLP to take the following actions by 4/11/11: Pay Petitioner EEOC $2,500.00 for having to seek judicial enforcement of the subpoena; Provide the EEOC a complete copy of the Memphis law firm's harrassment-investigation file with privileged or work-product redacted; & Make further good-faith efforts to locate documents responsive to the subpoena & provide all responsive documents found to the EEOC. Respondent shall certify compliance with this Order by 4/11/11. Any failure to comply will put Respondent in jeopardy of more sanctions. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/9/2011. (jct)
February 17, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Evidentiary Hearing continued and reset for 3/8/2011 at 1:00 PM in Jonesboro Courtroom #324 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/17/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Respondent's Letter)(mkf)
January 11, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Respondent Osceola Nursing Home LLP d/b/a Osceola Healthcare to respond - fully, completely & promptly - to the EEOC's July 2010 subpoena by 1/31/2011. The Court will hold a (Status/Evidentiary Hearing on 2/11/2011 at 2:00 PM in Little Rock Courtroom # B-155 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr.) Petitioner & Respondent are ordered to appear. As an entity, Respondent must be represented by counsel at the hearing. If Respondent fails to respond to the subpoena fully & completely as ordered by 1/31/2011, then the Court will take evidence & hear argument at the February 11th hearing on the appropriate sanction. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve this Order on Osceola Nuring Home LLP's registered agent for service, Stafford Kees, Jr., as soon as possible & in person, if possible. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/11/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Osceola Nursing Home LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Kenneth Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Osceola Nursing Home LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?