Gordon v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Roosevelt Gordon, Jr
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2011cv00016
Filed: January 21, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 18 Memorandum and Order entered this date, the final determination of the Commissioner is affirmed & Plaintiff's case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/31/2012. (jct)
February 22, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Clerk is directed to consolidate cases 3:11-CV-00016 JWC & 3:11-CV-00029 HDY, with Case 3:11-CV-00016 JWC designated as the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 2/22/2011. (jct)
February 8, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to inform the Court no later than 2/22/11 whether there is any reason that cases 3:11CV00016-JWC and 3:11CV00029-HDY should not be consolidated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 2/8/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Virginia Watson Keyes
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Gordon, Jr
Represented By: Anthony W. Bartels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?