Evance v. Trumann Health Services LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jenny Evance
Defendant: Betty Begley, Gladis Cortinas, Jackie Kelly, Jacky Holt, Trumann Health Services LLC, Harold McMickle and Dayna Shrout
Case Number: 3:2011cv00025
Filed: January 31, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Defendants' Motion for Costs. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/18/2013. (jak)
June 18, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 53 Order entered this date, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/18/2012. (jct)
October 26, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 36 Protective Order, the Court finds that all information revealed in depositions taken in this case regarding the residents of Trumann Health & Rehabilitation Center will be considered Confidential Information. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/26/2011. (jct)
October 12, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER Pursuant to Stipulation and Agreement regarding confidential information in this cause of action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/12/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evance v. Trumann Health Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Begley
Represented By: Melissa McJunkins Duke
Represented By: Elizabeth Rowe Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gladis Cortinas
Represented By: Melissa McJunkins Duke
Represented By: Elizabeth Rowe Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Kelly
Represented By: Elizabeth Rowe Cummings
Represented By: Melissa McJunkins Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacky Holt
Represented By: Elizabeth Rowe Cummings
Represented By: Melissa McJunkins Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trumann Health Services LLC
Represented By: Melissa McJunkins Duke
Represented By: Elizabeth Rowe Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold McMickle
Represented By: Elizabeth Rowe Cummings
Represented By: Melissa McJunkins Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayna Shrout
Represented By: Elizabeth Rowe Cummings
Represented By: Melissa McJunkins Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Evance
Represented By: Larry J. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?