Ashley v. St Bernard's Hospital Inc

Plaintiff: Jimmy Ashley
Defendant: St Bernard's Hospital Inc
Case Number: 3:2011cv00028
Filed: February 3, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12131
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 19 Joint MOTION to Dismiss, this action is dismissed against Defendant with prejudice. Except as set forth in the settlement agreement, all parties will bear their own attorneys' fees & costs. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/24/2012. (jct)
March 20, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery, Dispositive Motions & Expert Disclosure Deadlines. (Discovery due by 5/25/2012; Dispositive Motions due by 6/8/2012; Pretrial Disclosure Sheets due by 6/25/2012). All deadlines not listed remain in effect as set out in 12 Amended Final Scheduling Order. The trial date remains set for 7/24/2012. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/20/2012. (jct)
November 9, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Joint Motion to Stay. The case is stayed for 60 days. The parties are reminded that the motions deadline & trial date remain as set. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/9/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashley v. St Bernard's Hospital Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Ashley
Represented By: Edward I. Zwilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Bernard's Hospital Inc
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Represented By: Paul D. Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?