Gray et al v. McKann et al

Plaintiff: Rubby James Gray and Paul Bashford
Defendant: Jack McKann, John Smith and Debra McMullian
Case Number: 3:2011cv00061
Filed: March 30, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2012 98 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 97 Memorandum and Order entered this date, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice, for failure to prosecute. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/26/2012. (jct)
February 22, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff Rubby Gray to file a Response to 89 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss within 15 days of the date of this Order. Failure to respond to the Motion may result in the dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint, for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/22/2012. (jct)
October 26, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 52 Defendants' Motion to Compel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 80 Plaintiff's request to stay discovery is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/26/2011. (jct)
September 9, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff Bashford to notify this Court of his current address & his intent to continue prosecution with this action, pro se, within 30 days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of Plaintiff Bashford from this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/9/2011. (jct)
September 7, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 52 Defendants' First MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from Plaintiff Gray, directing Plaintiff Gray to file a Response within 10 days of the date of this Order. Failure to respond to this Court's Order may result in the dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiff's Complaint for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/7/2011. (jct)
August 24, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: (Discovery due by 2/24/2012; Dispositive Motions due by 3/24/2012). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/24/2011. (jct)
July 26, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for Defendants Debra McMullian & Dianne Chamberlain & the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the summons & Amended Complaints 14 & 15 on said Defendants at the addresses provided under seal, without prepayment of fees & costs or security therefore. The Clerk is directed to correct the name of Defendant Nurse Diane to Dianne Chamberlain. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/26/2011. (jct)
July 1, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to Summons being returned, unexecuted, on Defendants Debra McMullian & Nurse Diane, the Defendants are directed to provide the Court the last-known addresses of these two Defendants w/i 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/1/2011. (jct)
June 29, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 17 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney in their entirety. Accordingly, Defendant Jack McKann is DISMISSED from Plaintiffs' Complaints for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/29/2011. (jct)
June 7, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for Defendants Smith, McMullian, Hibbit & Nurse Diane, & the U.S. Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of the Amended Complaints 14 & 15 upon these Defendants, without prepayment of fees & costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/7/2011. (jct)
April 11, 2011 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiffs to submit either the $350 statutory filing fee or in forma pauperis applications within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiffs the applications, together with the filing fee calculation sheets. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/11/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray et al v. McKann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rubby James Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Bashford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack McKann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra McMullian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?