Huffman v. Securitas USA

Plaintiff: Darrel Huffman
Defendant: Securitas USA
Case Number: 3:2011cv00082
Filed: May 11, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 35 Order Dismissing Case without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/16/11. (kpr)
August 8, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Darrel Huffman. Attorney Kimberly B. Dale is appointed for Darrel Huffman for the limited purpose of meeting with Huffman, evaluating his claims & considering whether to file an amended complaint clarifying the allegations & legal theories. The Court appreciates Ms. Dale accepting this limited appointment. Amended complaint or motion to withdraw due by 9/15/11. If no amended complaint is filed, then as Huffman requests in the alternative, the Court will dismiss his complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/8/2011. (jct)
May 11, 2011 2 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S ORDER provisionally approving, pursuant to General Order No. 29, 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Darrel Huffman. Signed at the Direction of the Court by Deputy Clerk on 5/11/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huffman v. Securitas USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securitas USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrel Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?