Wisham v. McClung et al
Plaintiff: Randell E Wisham
Defendant: Gerald McClung, Montie Sanders, Sam Poole, Kaleb Rowe and Adam Smith
Case Number: 3:2011cv00119
Filed: June 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Clay
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 JUDGMENT in favor of defendants pursuant to 64 Order of Dismissal. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/11/2012. (jak)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER, directing the Plaintiff to file within 30 days of this Order, a Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 58 , 59 & 60 and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts as set forth in this Order. Failure to comply will result in (a) all of the facts set forth in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by the Plaintiff or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 06/26/2012. (kcs)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER directing Plaintiff to complete & return to the Court, on or before 4/23/2012, the revised Medical Authorization forms that Defendants sent to him on 4/9/2012. Plaintiff is reminded that if he fails to timely & properly do so, this case will be dismissed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 37(b)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/18/2012. (jct)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 45 Defendants' MOTION to Compel and for Extension of Time. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of the VA Medical Authorization forms that are attached to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Plaintiff must fully compl ete & return, to the Court, the VA Medical Authorization forms on or before 4/13/2012. Plaintiff is advised that his failure to timely & properly do so will result in the dismissal of this lawsuit. Defendants have until 6/13/2012 to file any dispositive motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/3/2012. (jct)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER directing the Clerk to issue summons for Defendant Adam Smith, at the Corning Police Department, Corning, Arkansas. The U.S. Marshall is directed to serve the summons, Complaint, Amended Complaint, Second Amended Complaint & the 8/18/11 Order on Defendant Smith without prepayment of fees & costs & security therefor. Nevertheless, Defendants should file Smith's last known private mailing address, under seal, so that the Court may use that address if service on Smith at the Corning Police Department is unsuccessful. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/13/2011. (jct)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis & a prisoner trust fund calculation sheet, & directing Plaintiff to file the fully completed Application & calculation sheet w/i 30 days of the entry of this Orde r. Plaintiff shall file, w/i 30 days of the entry of this Order, an Amended Complaint containing the information specified. Plaintiff is reminded that the failure to timely & properly comply with this Order will result in dismissal of the case. Motion terminated: 1 Plaintiff's incomplete MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 6/28/2011. (jct)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wisham v. McClung et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randell E Wisham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald McClung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montie Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaleb Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?