Sutton v. Arkansas State University et al

Plaintiff: Toby J Sutton
Defendant: Arkansas State University, Patricia Bailey and Kellie Thomas
Case Number: 3:2011cv00123
Filed: June 30, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice pursuant to 52 Stipulation. The parties will bear their own costs and fees to the litigation. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/1/2014. (jak)
May 6, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion to Compel. Mr. Sutton has seven days from the date of this Order, to and including May 13, 2014, to respond to defendants' requests for production of documents. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/6/2014. (jak)
August 14, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 36 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Patricia Bailey, Kellie Thomas. The jury trial of this matter currently set for the week of September 17, 2012, is removed from the Court's trial docket. A new trial date and scheduling deadlines will be entered following issuance of the mandate by the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 08/14/2012. (jak)
January 13, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/13/2012. (jct)
September 1, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part & denying in part 7 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss. Sutton's breach of contract claims & Whistle-Blower Act claims against Bailey & Thomas in their individual capacities are dismissed with prejudice. Su tton's breach of contract claims & Whistle-Blower Act claim against Arkansas State University & against Bailey & Thomas in their official capacities are dismissed without prejudice so that they may be pursued in the Arkansas Claims Commission. B ecause all of Sutton's claims against ASU are dismissed, it is dismissed from this action. Sutton's section 1983 claims against Bailey & Thomas in their official capacities for prospective relief are not dismissed. His section 1983 claims against Bailey & Thomas in their individual capacities are not dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/1/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutton v. Arkansas State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby J Sutton
Represented By: Rebecca Worsham
Represented By: Donn H. Mixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas State University
Represented By: Ryan M. Wilson
Represented By: Mark Alan Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Bailey
Represented By: Mark Alan Mayfield
Represented By: Ryan M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellie Thomas
Represented By: Mark Alan Mayfield
Represented By: Ryan M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?