Mills v. Clay County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Frederick A Mills
Defendant: Montie Sanders, David Leach and Kalem Rouse
Case Number: 3:2011cv00154
Filed: July 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Clay
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 JUDGMENT, pursuant to 36 Order on Plaintiff's Motion to voluntarily dismiss entered this date, this case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/21/2011. (jct)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER dismissing as moot 25 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS due to the parties consent to the exercise of jurisdction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge; GRANTING 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kalem Rouse. Plaintiff's claims against Kalem Rouse are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/26/2011. (jct)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Frederick A Mills., (Emergency Hearing set for 9/14/2011 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1A before Magistrate Judge Beth Deere regarding the allegation that officials at C lay County Detention Center are refusing to complete the calculation sheet forms required for the Court to determine in forma pauperis status) Mr. Mills will be transported to the hearing, & a subpoena will be issued to the Director or Warden of the Clay County Detention Center to insure his presence at the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/1/2011. (jct)
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Frederick A Mills. If Mr. Mills wishes to proceed with this lawsuit, he must submit a new request to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the $350 filing fee w/i 30 days of th is Order. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Warden/Director of the Clay County Detention Center. A county jail cannot be sued under Section 1983, & the Clay County Detention Center is dismissed. Mr. Mills is ordered to file an amended & substituted complaint w/i 30 days pursuant to this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/8/2011. (jct)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. Clay County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montie Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalem Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick A Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?