Whitley et al v. Terminix International Inc

Plaintiff: Wayne Whitley and Cathy Whitley
Defendant: Terminix International Inc
Case Number: 3:2011cv00168
Filed: August 18, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER based on 31 Stipulation of Dismissal, the above case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/19/2013. (jak)
July 6, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Agreed MOTION to Amend 18 Scheduling Order. The following deadlines are set: (Amended Pleadings or addition of parties due by 10/1/2012, Discovery due by 11/3/2012, Motions due by 11/29/2012, Pretrial Disclosure Sheet du e by 1/12/2013, Status Report due by 12/14/2012, Plaintiffs' disclosure of experts due by 8/15/2012; Defendant's disclosure of experts due by 9/15/2012). Remaining deadlines & new trial date will be set by separate Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/6/2012. (jct)
March 28, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiffs to disclose experts by 5/15/12; Defendants to disclose experts by 6/15/12; the addition of parties or amendment of pleadings shall be completed by 7/1/12. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/28/2012. (jct)
October 3, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/3/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitley et al v. Terminix International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Whitley
Represented By: Johnny Wayne Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Whitley
Represented By: Johnny Wayne Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terminix International Inc
Represented By: Mark Alan Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?