Bright v. Evonic Cyro LLC et al

Plaintiff: Earrick Bright
Defendant: Does and Evonic Cyro LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv00180
Filed: September 6, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Motion for Costs; denying 53 Motion to Quash. Evonik is awarded costs in the amount of $1,1621.95. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/18/2013. (jak)
May 30, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 50 Opinion and Order. It is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case be, and it hereby is, dismissed. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 05/30/2013. (jak)
November 5, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 26 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/5/2012. (jak)
March 12, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 3 Evonik's Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons stated, the Court denies Evonik's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's ADA and FMLA claims, but grants Evonik's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's RA claim. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/12/2012. (jct)
January 23, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Stanford G. Wilson; granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Porsche D. Leonce. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/23/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bright v. Evonic Cyro LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evonic Cyro LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earrick Bright
Represented By: Brian D. Dover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?