Lewis v. Bonner et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Antwon Lewis
Defendant: Coleman, Sprague, Gamble, Teresa Bonner and Mobley
Case Number: 3:2011cv00181
Filed: September 8, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 32 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/14/2012. (jak)
August 28, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Defendant's Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is ordered to sign and produce a Medical Authorization within ten days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of his claims against the Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 08/28/2012. (jak) (Docket text modified on 8/28/2012 to correct the description of the linked document.) (thd)
July 17, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 9 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Joe J. Vope in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants Bonner, Coleman, Gamble & Mobley are DISMISSED for Plaintiff's failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/17/2012. (jct)
June 29, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to mail a copy of 9 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, and 8 Order to pltf at his new address, Tucker Unit, P.O. Box 240, Tucker, AR 72168-0240; pltf has until 7/16/12 to file his objections to the pending Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/29/12. (vjt)
June 13, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding service is appropriate for Defendant Sprague; directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare a summons for Defendant Sprague; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of 2 Plaintiff's Complaint and summons on Defendant without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/13/2012. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Bonner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Antwon Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?