Newton v. Crittenden County Detention Facility

Plaintiff: Daniel Newton
Defendant: Crittenden County Detention Facility and L Schrader
Case Number: 3:2011cv00184
Filed: September 8, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, consistent with 29 Order entered this date, this case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/5/2012. (jct)
June 4, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant Floyd Schrader's 25 MOTION for extension of time to file dispositive motions. The Court will issue a new scheduling order, if necessary. Plaintiff Daniel Newton has 30 days to respond to 25 MOTION to Dismiss. His failure to respond to the motion, & to this Court's Order, could result in the dismissal of his claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/4/2012. (jct)
November 18, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's claims against the Crittenden County Detention Facility are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/18/11. (vjt)
September 20, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare a summons for Defendant Schrader & the U.S. Marshal is requested to serve Defendant Schrader with the 2 Complaint & 6 Amended Complaint filed by Daniel Newton. Mr. Newton's claims against the Crittenden County Detention Facility will be addressed in a separate recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/20/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newton v. Crittenden County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crittenden County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Schrader
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?