Stricklin v. Dolgencorp LLC

Plaintiff: Joshua D Stricklin
Defendant: Dolgencorp LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv00246
Filed: November 15, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Defendant's Motion for Costs. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 05/14/2013. (jak)
February 12, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 43 OPINION AND ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/12/2013. (jak)
November 15, 2011 2 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S ORDER, pursuant to General Order No. 29, provisionally approving 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joshua D Stricklin. Signed at the Direction of the Court by J Turman on 11/15/2011. (jct) (copy handed to Plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stricklin v. Dolgencorp LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua D Stricklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp LLC
Represented By: Keith D. Frazier
Represented By: Jessica T. Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?