Watson v. Ephlin et al
Plaintiff: James Watson
Defendant: Chris Lassley, Betty Thompson, Jerry Henry, Chris Ellis, Kyle Carr, Grant Barnett and Bobby Ephlin
Case Number: 3:2011cv00269
Filed: December 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 LETTER/ORDER to counsel regarding the trial date of September 9, 2014. The case will be tried or dismissed. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/6/2014. (jak)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 96 MOTION to Continue. The case will be removed from the Court's trial docket of February 18, 2014 and a new scheduling order will be forthwith entered. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/3/2013. (jak)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying 92 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Accordingly, Mr. Watson is directed to forthwith identify exactly what paper work he did not receive and the date on which he was released from Cummins. If this information is not submitted before 5:00 p.m., Tuesday, September 31, 2013, I will summarily deny the motion. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/16/2013. (jak)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 88 Motion for Continuance. The case will be removed from the Court's trial docket of July 30, 2013. A new scheduling order will be entered forthwith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/19/2013. (jak)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER denying 70 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 71 Defendant's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/15/2013. (jak)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 85 Lamar Porter's Motion to withdraw as attorney for the Plaintiff. Accordingly, John C. Barttelt is appointed to represent Plaintiff in this action. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Mr. Barttelt a copy of this Order and the entire case file. If Mr. Barttelt is unable to serve as appointed counsel, he must file a motion to withdraw 21 days of the receipt of this Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/12/2013. (jak)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re 81 Notice/Motion to Appoint counsel. Plaintiff's motion is granted. J. Lamar Porter is appointed to represent Plaintiff in this action. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Mr. Roberts a copy of this Order and the entire case file. If Mr. Roberts is unable to serve as appointed counsel, he must file a motion to withdraw within 21 days of the receipt of this Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/27/2013. (jak)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 65 Motion to Dismiss; granting 67 Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, all claims against Separate Defendants Grant Barnett, Kyle Carr, Chris Ellis, Jerry Henry, Chris Lassley, and Betty Thompson are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 06/18/2013. (jak)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER directing Mr. James Watson to respond to 65 Motion to Dismiss and 67 Motion for Summary Judgment by 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, June 13, 2013, otherwise the Motions will be granted. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/6/2013. (jak)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER directing the Clerk to refrain from docketing any future settlement offers in this case and to refrain from docketing any future written discovery in this case. Plaintiff's 59 Motion to Compel is denied. Defendant's 62 Motion to Strike is granted. Accordingly, all untimely discovery requests filed by Plaintiff 56 , 57 , 58 are struck. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 05/10/2013. (jak)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying 31 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss due to Plaintiff being incarcerated on the date in question. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of the September 18, 2012 Scheduling Order 30 . Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/6/2013. (jak)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 LETTER ORDER informing Plaintiff Watson that if he does not respond to 31 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by 5:00 p.m. Thursday, January 31, 2013, the motion will be granted. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/24/2013. (jak)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL that Plaintiff's claims against Defendants, in their official capacities, are DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court CERTIFIES, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from th is Order of Partial Dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Plaintiff may PROCEED with his excessive force & failure to protect claims against Defendants, in their individual capacities. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for each of the Defendants & the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, 2 Complaint, 5 Amended Complaint & this Order on them without prepayment of fees & costs or security therefor. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/24/2012. (jct)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Ephlin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Lassley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Ephlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?