Page v. Langston et al

Plaintiff: Jesse D Page
Defendant: Ron Harvey and Dan Langston
Case Number: 3:2011cv00275
Filed: December 6, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, consistent with 26 Order entered this date, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/4/2012. (jct)
February 15, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 17 Defendants' First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2), Mr. Page has 30 days to notify the Court whether he seeks to proceed with the claims raised in this lawsuit. If he has been released from the Greene County Jail, he must provide the court a valid, updated address. Mr. Page's failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of his claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/15/2012. (jct)
December 21, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to issue summons for Defendants Langston & Harvey. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of 2 Complaint & 5 Amended Complaint upon the defendants without prepayment of fees & costs or posting security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/21/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Page v. Langston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse D Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?