McAnally v. Barker Manufacturing Company

Plaintiff: David Keith McAnally
Defendant: Barker Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv00019
Filed: January 24, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the parties' 22 Stipulation of Dismissal, the Court dismisses this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/1/2014. (jak)
January 29, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER removing this case from the trial calendar for the week of February 10, 2014. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/29/2014. (jak)
June 18, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the parties' request that the Court set a new trial date. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove this case from the trial docket for the week of July 8, 2013. A new trial date will be set and an Amended FInal Scheduling Order will be issues by separate Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/18/2013. (jak)
March 2, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Plaintiff's Motion for attorney Eric F. Kayira to appear pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/2/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAnally v. Barker Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Keith McAnally
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Eric F. Kayira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barker Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?