Gregory v. Schueck Steel et al

Plaintiff: James C Gregory
Defendant: Schueck Steel, Thomas Schueck and Lexicon
Case Number: 3:2012cv00065
Filed: March 5, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to Local Rule 5.5 (c)(2), this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to comply with the Court's 27 Order and to diligently prosecute this action. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 04/18/2013. (jak)
March 18, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff Gregory to submit his status report by April 17, 2013, and state whether he intends to pursue this case and if so whether he will be ready for trial on May 13, 2013. The Clerk is directed to mail this Order to Gregory at the address on the docket sheet and also to 511 3rd Avenue, Seattle, Washington 98104. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 03/18/2013. (jak)
July 17, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reflecting the parties were instructed to file their Rule 26(f) Report by 7/2/2012, & have not done so. Therefore, the parties are directed to file their Rule 26(f) Report by 7/27/2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/17/2012. (jct)
March 14, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that, pursuant to Rule 4(c)(iii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the U.S. Marshal for the Eastern District of Arkansas is directed to serve the summons & complaint on the defendants in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/14/2012. (jct)
March 8, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER advising plaintiff James C. Gregory to be familiar & comply with all the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as well as the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to so comply can result in dismissal of plaintiff's claim. The Clerk is directed to serve this Order on plaintiff by both regular mail & certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/8/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. Schueck Steel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schueck Steel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Schueck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexicon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?