Banks v. Prudential Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: Alice Banks
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2012cv00072
Filed: March 9, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 26 Opinion and Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/30/2015. (jak)
May 16, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct the Nature of Suit for this action as "890 Other Statutory Actions", & the Cause of Action citation as "29 U.S.C. Section 1132(a) - ERISA". The 7 Initial Scheduling Order is hereby set aside. An ERISA scheduling order will follow entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/16/2012. (jct)
March 16, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Prudential Insurance Company of America's answer due on or before 3/30/2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/16/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Banks
Represented By: William Jennings Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Kimberly Dickerson Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?