Henderson et al v. Coleman Company Inc et al

Plaintiff: Brent Henderson and Ami Henderson
Defendant: John Does, Gold Peak Group, Gold Peak Industries (Holdings) Limited, GPE International Limited, GPI International Limited, GP Industries Limited, GP Batteries International Limited, Gold Peak Industries (North America) Inc, GP Battery Marketing (Latin America) Inc, Coleman Company Inc, Jarden Corporation and Sky City Holdings International Ltd
Case Number: 3:2012cv00073
Filed: March 9, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims against separate defendants Gold Peak Group; Gold Peak Industries (Holdings) Limited; GPE International Limited; GPI International Limited; GP Industries Limited; GP Batteries Int ernational Limited; Gold Peak Industries (North America), Inc.; and GP Battery Marketing (Latin America), Inc. are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, pursuant to settlement. It is further ordered that Plaintiffs' claims against separate defendants Sky City Holdings International, Ltd, and John Does 1 through 5 are dismissed without prejudice. This action is dismissed in its entirety. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/3/2013. (jak)
August 23, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER informing Plaintiff's to file objections within five days from entry date of this Order to 23 Motion to Dismiss against separate Defendants Sky City Holdings International Ltd., and Defendants John Does 1 through 5. In the event that no objections are filed, the Court will dismiss said claims without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/23/2013. (jak)
March 4, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims solely against Separate Defendants The Coleman Company Inc and Jarden corporation are dismissed with prejudice. The case will proceed on the remaining claims against the remaining defendants. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 03/04/2013. (jak)
January 7, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Plaintiff's Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/7/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson et al v. Coleman Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Peak Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Peak Industries (Holdings) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPE International Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPI International Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GP Industries Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GP Batteries International Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Peak Industries (North America) Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GP Battery Marketing (Latin America) Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coleman Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarden Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky City Holdings International Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Henderson
Represented By: Paul J. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ami Henderson
Represented By: Paul J. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?