Despain v. Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Michelle Despain
Defendant: Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Thirdparty_defendant: Tana Despain and Jack Despain
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Counter_claimant: Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Counter_defendant: Michelle Despain
Case Number: 3:2012cv00105
Filed: April 25, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the parties' joint stipulation, all claims and counterclaims in this action are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/23/2015. (jak)
August 5, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT of Funds. Pursuant to Local Rule 67.1, the Clerk of the Court is directed to disburse to Northwestern Mutual from the funds on deposit in the Court's registry the sum total of $10,194.30, said funds to be disbursed t o Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company as payee and delivered to Northwestern Mutual's counsel of record in this action at the following address: Attn: Walter D. Willson, Wells Marble & Hurst, PLLC, 300 Concourse Blvd., STE 200, Ridgeland, Mississippi 39157. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/05/2013. (jak)
May 10, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion for Attorney Fees and 25 Amended Motion for Attorney Fees. Northwestern Mutual is entitled to recover an attorney's fee of $10,125.00 and costs in the amount of $69.30, for a total of $10,194.30, from the funds deposited in the Court's registry. Northwestern Mutual is directed to submit a proposed disbursement order to the Court within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 05/10/2013. (jak)
September 14, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion to Stay. All parties are directed to file a status report with the Court six months from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 09/14/2012. (jak)
September 10, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion to Dismiss Party. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/10/2012. (jlp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Despain v. Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Despain
Represented By: William Jennings Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Walter D. Willson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Tana Despain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Jack Despain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Walter D. Willson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Walter D. Willson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Michelle Despain
Represented By: William Jennings Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?