Williams v. Holley et al

Plaintiff: Roseetta Williams
Defendant: Nicholas Holley and Jonesboro Arkansas, City of
Case Number: 3:2012cv00108
Filed: May 3, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the parties' joint motion to dismiss, 44 , this Court dismisses Plaintiff's complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/1/2015. (jak)
August 19, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion in Limine at this time, but it may be refiled if this case is remanded for trial. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/19/2014. (jak)
December 3, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 32 Notice of Appeal filed by Nicholas Holley, this matter is removed from the trial docket for the week of December 9, 2013. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/3/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Holley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roseetta Williams
Represented By: Jessica Ann Virden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Holley
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonesboro Arkansas, City of
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?