Scroggin v. Credit Bureau of Jonesboro Inc

Plaintiff: Brandon Scroggin
Defendant: Credit Bureau of Jonesboro Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv00128
Filed: May 25, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court hereby awards CBJ attorney's fees in the amount of $30,905.00 paralegal fees in the amount of $1,425.00, and costs in the amount of  6;890.32. Alternatively, if it is determined that CBJ is not entitled to an award of attorney's fees and costs, the Court hereby awards CBJ costs in the amount of $218.55 pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 68(d). Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/20/2013. (jak)
July 18, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to the jury verdict delivered on July 16, 2013, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that (1) plaintiff Brandon Scroggin prevailed on his claim that defendant Credit Bureau of Jonesboro, Inc. twice violated the Fair Debt Collect ion Practices Act (FDCPA) and the Arkansas Fair Debt Collection Practices Act (AFDCPA), (2) plaintiff Brandon Scroggin is awarded no damages either actual or statutoryfor defendant Credit Bureau of Jonesboro, Inc. violations of the FDCPA and AFDCP A, (3) defendant Credit Bureau of Jonesboro, Inc.'s prevailed on its claim that plaintiff Brandon Scroggin brought this action in bad faith, and (4) plaintiff Brandon Scroggin prevailed on defendant Credit Bureau of Jonesboro, Inc.'s claim that he brought this action for the purpose of harassment. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/18/2013. (jak)
June 17, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER notifying the parties that it requires both parties to agree to a settlement conference before such a conference is conducted. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/17/2013. (jak)
May 15, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion to Dismiss and for an Order of civility. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 05/15/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scroggin v. Credit Bureau of Jonesboro Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Bureau of Jonesboro Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Scroggin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?