Gilmore v. McCain et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Gilmore
Defendant: Jack McCain, John Smith, John Sparks, Does and Craighead County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2012cv00133
Filed: June 4, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 24 Order that was entered on this day, it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED, and ADJUDGED that this case is hereby DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/4/2013. (dmn)
October 18, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing the claims against the Doe defendants without prejudice. Plaintiff was directed by 5 Order to identify the separate Doe defendents and the time for doing so has passed. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/18/2012. (jak)
July 9, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Beth Deere in all respects. Mr. Gilmore's claims against the Craighead County Detention Center are DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/9/2012. (jct)
June 18, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Clerk to issue Summonses for Defendants McCain, Smith & Sparks. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the Summonses, along with 2 Complaint & 4 Amended Complaint, without prepayment of fees or security. If Mr. Gilmore wishes to proceed against John Doe Defendants, he must identify & serve those Defendants on or before 10/9/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/18/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilmore v. McCain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack McCain
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Smith
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sparks
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?