Elliott Electric Supply Inc v. LRE/Royal Electric LLC et al

Plaintiff: Elliott Electric Supply Inc
Defendant: LRE/Royal Electric LLC, Employers Mutual Casualty Company, W G Yates & Sons Construction Company, Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 3:2012cv00146
Filed: June 15, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 74 Order entered this day, this case is hereby dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/04/2013. (jak)
October 17, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 71 Stipulation of Dismissal, Third party plaintiff Employers Mutual Casualty Company's 14 Complaint and 47 Amended Complaint against third-party defendants George E. Smith, Mike D. Smith, Randy C. Smith, Mandie Blake Sm ith, Randy C. Smith Revocable Stock Trust, Marty L. Warner, Stephanie Ann Warner, and Stephanie Ann Warner Revocable Stock Trust are dismissed without prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorney's fees. The remaining parties may proceed according to 40 Scheduling Order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/17/2013. (jak)
August 12, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 69 Stipulation of Dismissal, Employers Mutual Casualty Company's 14 Complaint and 47 Amended Complaint against third party defendants Willie D. Godwin, Brenda J. Godwin, Lawrence Dean Wallace, and Marilyn K. Wallace are dismissed without prejudice.Each party will bear its own costs and attorney's fees. The remaining parties may proceed according to 40 Scheduling Order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/12/2013. (jak)
June 24, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE as to George Smith pending resolution of the Bankruptcy proceeding re 63 Notice. The remaining parties may proceed according to 40 Final Scheduling Order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 06/24/2013. (jak)
June 17, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 61 Order Staying Case reflecting that the case is stayed only as to LRE/Royal Electric, LLC. The remaining parties may proceed according to the 40 Scheduling Order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/17/2013. (jak)
June 14, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 362 pending resolution of the bankruptcy proceeding. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/14/2013. (jak)
April 30, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 58 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Plaintiff Elliott Electric Supply Inc's 1 Complaint and 44 Amended Complaint against Defendants Employers Mutual Casualty Company, W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company, Fidelity & Deposit Com pany of Maryland, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America are dismissed with prejudice. Elliott Electric's 1 Complaint and 44 Amended Complaint against defendant LRE/Royal Electric LLC are dismissed without prejudice. Employers Mutual Casualty Company's 14 cross-claim and third party complaint shall remain pending for trial. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 04/30/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott Electric Supply Inc v. LRE/Royal Electric LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliott Electric Supply Inc
Represented By: Danny R. Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LRE/Royal Electric LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W G Yates & Sons Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?