Hellums v. Mills et al
Plaintiff: Michael Dewayne Hellums
Defendant: Susan Cox
Case Number: 3:2012cv00188
Filed: July 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JUDGMENT pursuant to 17 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. This case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/13/2012. (jak)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing plaintiff to inform the Court of his new address within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 09/12/2012. (jak)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing that parties may file dispositive motions on or before 1/30/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 08/30/2012. (jak)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Beth Deere. Mr. Hellum's claims against Defendant Mills are DISMISSED without prejudice. In addition, his claims against Defendant Cox in her official capacity are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 08/13/2012. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hellums v. Mills et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dewayne Hellums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?