Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin v. Kemp et al

Plaintiff: Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin
Defendant: Tera Kemp, Medic One LLC, Air Evac EMS Inc, Shelby County Healthcare Corporation, Medpay Assurance LLC and Missouri Department of Social Services
Case Number: 3:2012cv00216
Filed: September 17, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Joint Motion for Disbursement. The Clerk of Court is directed to disburse the funds as follows: $22,163.73, plus 88.7% of any accrued interest, to The Med, by check payable to The Smith Group; and $2,836.27, plus 1 1.3% of any accrued interest, to Medic One, by check payable to Medic One, LLC. The Court further directs the Clerk to file a statement confirming disbursements and the exact amounts. This action shall be dismissed with prejudice upon disbursement of the interpleaded funds without further notice, hearing, or order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/10/2014. (jak)
December 19, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion for Default Judgment. For the reasons set forth in this Order, Viking is hereby discharged from any further liability regarding the policy proceeds at issue and is dismissed from this case with prejudice. Consistent with this Order, the Court hereby orders that within 30 days of the date of this Order, separate defendants making a claim to the disputed funds submit to the Court filings from which this Court can determine by a preponderance of the evidence the appropriate distribution of the disputed funds and the priority in which claims should be paid in this action. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/19/2013. (jak)
February 1, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss Party. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the MDSS as a party. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/1/2013. (jak)
October 5, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 1 Complaint for Interpleader directing Viking Insurance to deposit the $25,000 in its possession by check payable to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas. The Clerk of the Court is directed to invest the sum in an interest bearing account pursuant to Local Rule 67.1, until further advised. The Clerk of the Court is directed to deduct from the income earned on the investment the appropriate fee. Further, interpleader defendan ts Tera Kemp, Medic One LLC, Air Evac EMS d/b/a AIR Evac Lifeteam, Shelby County Healthcare Corp, Medpay Assurance LLC, and Missouri Dept. of Social Services are restrained from instituting or prosecuting against Viking any action that affects the fu nds at issue in this case without first obtaining an Order from this Court. Viking shall cause this Order to be served personally on the Clerk of the Court and the Financial Deputy of the Court and all paerties within ten days of this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/5/2012. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin v. Kemp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viking Insurance Company of Wisconsin
Represented By: John R. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tera Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medic One LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Evac EMS Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby County Healthcare Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medpay Assurance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Department of Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?