Buck v. Baptist Memorial Healthcare Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Janet Buck
Defendant: John Does and Baptist Memorial Healthcare Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv00250
Filed: November 5, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 49 OPINION AND ORDER; Judgment is entered in favor of the defendants on the claims of Janet Buck. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/27/2013. (jak)
June 12, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion for Sanctions. The Court orders the defendant to pay the fee for the court reporter for the deposition scheduled on May 6, 2013. The plaintiff's request for an award of an attorneys fee is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/12/2013. (jak)
June 7, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Buck must file her amended complaint within seven days from the entry of this Order. The defendants' 12 Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/7/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buck v. Baptist Memorial Healthcare Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Memorial Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: Paul D. McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Buck
Represented By: Troy L. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?