Wells v. Payment et al

Plaintiff: Willie Wells
Defendant: Payment and Jeff
Case Number: 3:2012cv00251
Filed: November 6, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in accordance with 73 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that the complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/26/2014. (jak)
February 10, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants shall transport Plaintiff, together with his medical and institutional records, to the February 12, 2014 Bench Trial, scheduled for 9:30 a.m. at the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse, 500 W. Capitol Ave., Court Room 4B, Little Rock, AR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/10/2014. (jak)
December 3, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 59 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety. Defendant's 54 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted. Plaintiff's official capacity claims against all defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff& #039;s individual capacity claims against defendants Coleman, Bonner, Mobley, Maloney, Thomas, and Brown are dismissed with prejudice. This case will proceed on plaintiff's sole remaining claim of excessive force against defendant Payment in his individual capacity. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/3/2013. (jak)
October 1, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a response to 54 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that complies with FED. R. CIV. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, and the instructions set forth in this Order. Plaintiff is a dvised that the failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result all of the facts set forth in Defendants partial summary judgment papers being deemed admitted or the dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/1/2013. (jak)
August 13, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 47 Motion to Compel. Defendants state they have provided to Plaintiff copies of all medical records in their possession, and will continue to supplement their responses with any additional medical documents discovered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/13/2013. (jak)
July 19, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 38 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 32 Motion to Dismiss and for Costs, or alternative Motion to Stay, is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/19/13. (vjt)
May 9, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Defendants' Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall file responses to Defendants' discovery requests, together with a signed medical authorization form, within fifteen days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 05/09/2013. (jak)
April 29, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct names of the Defendants Teresa Bonner and Shenisa Mobley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 04/29/2013. (jak)
April 25, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to respond to 32 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss within fifteen days of the date of this Order. Failure to respond may result in the dismissal without prejudice of this action, for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 04/25/2013. (jak)
April 2, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a Response to Defendants' 28 Motion to Compel within fifteen days of the date of this Order. Failure to respond may result in the dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiff's Complaint, for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 04/02/2013. (jak)
March 7, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to re-docket 24 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint as a supplement to 3 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 03/07/2013. (jak)
February 27, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing defendant Correctional Officer Jeff re 3 Amended Complaint filed by Willie Wells. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 02/27/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Payment et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?