Moore v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Ronnie Moore, Jr
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2012cv00301
Filed: December 11, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion for Attorney Fees and he is awarded $3,364.85 in fees and expenses, subject to offset if he has outstanding federal debts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/5/2015. (jak)
December 9, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reversing the Commissioner's decision and remanding this case to the Commissioner for resolution of the conflict and reconsideration of whether work exists that Mr. Moore can do. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/9/2014. (jak)
December 9, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in accordance with 15 Oral Argument Findings of Fact and Conclusions of law, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that the final decision of Carolyn W. Colvin, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, is AFFIRMED. Judgment is entered in favor of the Commissioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/9/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Moore, Jr
Represented By: Anthony W. Bartels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?