Vest v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Jason Vest
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2012cv00311
Filed: December 14, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff isawarded $2,032.65. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/2/2014. (jak)
January 28, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 15 Memorandum and Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that the final determination of the Commissioner is reversed and Plaintiff's case is remanded for further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/28/2014. (jak)
December 17, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jason Vest. Mr. Vest is directed to file a new in forma pauperis application within fourteen days of this Order. The application should be within the guidelines laid out in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/17/2012. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vest v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Vest
Represented By: Anthony W. Bartels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?