Brewer v. Jonesboro Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Todd Brewer
Defendant: Jonesboro Police Department, Craighead County Jail and Doe
Case Number: 3:2012cv00315
Filed: December 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Hot Spring
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 JUDGMENT consistent with 96 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law, Judgment is entered for defendant Jeremy Wheelis, and against plaintiff Jerry Todd Brewer. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/21/2015. (jak)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure the attendance of Plaintiff Jerry Todd Brewer, ADC# 600830, who is presently confined at the Ouachita River Correction Unit at 9:45 a.m. on Monday, July 13, 2015, for a bench trial in th is matter at the U.S. District Courtroom 324 located at 615 South Main, Jonesboro, Arkansas. The Arkansas Department of Correction is further directed to send with plaintiff his complete institutional and medical files. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/30/2015. (jak)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 72 order entered this day, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/12/2014. (ks)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying 69 Motion to Change Venue. Brewer's request for a jury trial is denied as untimely as well. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/29/2014. (jak)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER directing the Warden of the Southwest Arkansas Community Correction Center to ensure the attendance of Plaintiff Jerry Todd Brewer, ADC #600830 at 8:30 a.m. on Monday September 22, 2014, for the trial scheduled for that day at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 2D of the Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse. The Warden is further directed to send with plaintiff his complete institutional and medical files. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/11/2014. (jak)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 43 and 51 Motions to Compel. Defendant Jeremy Wheelis, however, is instructed to provide to Brewer all material that will be used, introduced, or referred to at trial. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/9/2014. (jak)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 44 Brewer's request for a subpoena. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to issue a subpoena for Phillip Crego the Jonesboro City Attorney. The subpoena shall direct Crego to appear at the trial scheduled for Monday, September 22, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom #2D, Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse, 500 West Capitol, Little Rock, Arkansas. The Clerk is directed to deliver the subpoena to the U.S. Marshal, who shall serve it without prepayment of fees as soon as possible, and no later than September 10, 2014. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/4/2014. (jak)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 36 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/26/2014. (jak)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Attorney Justin E. Parkey is appointed for the limited purpose of assisting Brewer obtain the documents specified in his motion. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/20/2014. (jak)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the Clerk to send Brewer a freeworld amended application to proceed in forma pauperis. Brewer shall within thirty days of this Order, submit the $350 filing fee or file an amended application to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to change the style of the case to reflect defendant Doe's correct name as Whellis. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/17/2013. (jak)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff a freeworld amended application to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall within 30 days submit the $350 filing fee to the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas or file an amended application to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is directed to provide Doe's name to the court. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 03/04/2013. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Jonesboro Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Todd Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonesboro Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?