McEntire v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Vergil McEntire
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2013cv00022
Filed: January 25, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/14/2014. (jak)
March 10, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in accordance with the Court's findings of fact and conclusions of law following oral argument by counsel at a hearing held on March 6, 2014, it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED, and ADJUDGED that the final decision of Carolyn W. Colvin, Acting C ommissioner of the Social Security Administration, is remanded for further proceedings. The ruling of the Commissioner is remanded for a proper evaluation of the report of Plaintiff's treating rheumatologist. This is a "sentence four" remand within the meaning of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/10/2014. (jak)
January 29, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is directed to provide within fourteen days of this Order some explanation as to her source(s) of income and/or means of supporting herself. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/29/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McEntire v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vergil McEntire
Represented By: Anthony W. Bartels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?