Smith v. Social Security Administration et al

Plaintiff: Kiara Smith
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Anthony Bartels and Charles D Turner
Case Number: 3:2013cv00029
Filed: January 30, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: To the extent that Plaintiff's 22 Objections can be considered a motion for reconsideration, the motion is denied. The Court additionally denies Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/6/2014. (jak)
January 28, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 20 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/28/2014. (jak)
January 9, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 2 Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due no later than 14 days from the date of this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/9/2014. (srw)
July 18, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing Defendant's Anthony Bartels and Charles D Turner due to Plaintiff can state no claim under section § 405(g) against them. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/18/2013. (jak)
May 30, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file proof of service with the Court within 30 days of the date of this Order, or the Complaint will be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/30/2013. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Social Security Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiara Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Bartels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?