Swiney v. Boyd et al

Plaintiff: Travis W Swiney
Defendant: Marty Boyd and Joe Bobo
Case Number: 3:2013cv00116
Filed: May 6, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 14 Order, Swiney's 1 Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/4/2013. (jak)
August 6, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to the fact that he has a duty to keep a current address on file with the Court. If by August 30, 2013, Swiney has not updated his address, the Court will dismiss his complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/6/2013. (jak)
June 28, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 6 Order, Swiney's 1 Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 06/28/2013. (jak)
May 24, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Travis W Swiney. If Mr. Swiney wishes to go forward with this case, he must file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay a $400.00 filing fee within thirty days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to forward Mr. Swiney an in forma pauperis application, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 05/24/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swiney v. Boyd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Bobo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis W Swiney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?