Futrell v. Osceola Police Department

Plaintiff: Tyrone Lee Futrell, Sr
Defendant: Osceola Police Department
Case Number: 3:2013cv00144
Filed: May 31, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 17 Order, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/25/2014. (jak)
January 8, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for the defendant, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of 2 Complaint and summons on defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/8/2014. (jak)
July 12, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff that if he fails to pay the initial partial filing fee witin thirty days of the date of this Order, his case will be dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rules 5.5 (c)(2). Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/12/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Futrell v. Osceola Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osceola Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Lee Futrell, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?