Duncan v. Lawrence Health Services et al

Plaintiff: Sandura Y Duncan
Defendant: Lawrence Memorial Hospital and Lawrence Health Services
Case Number: 3:2013cv00178
Filed: July 29, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Joint Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/18/2014. (jak)
August 14, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Pursuant to Rule 4(c)(iii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons and complaint on the defendants in this action. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/14/2013. (jak)
August 2, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to the fact that Plaintiff is required to be familiar and comply with all the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as well as the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to so comply can result in dismissal of plaintiff's claim. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve this Order on plaintiff by both regular and certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/2/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duncan v. Lawrence Health Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandura Y Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?