Ortega v. TA Operating LLC et al

Plaintiff: Christine Ortega
Defendant: TA Operating LLC and John Does
Case Number: 3:2013cv00197
Filed: September 4, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Joint Motion to Dismiss. The Court dismisses this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/14/2015. (jak)
September 23, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Stephen Curry, Deborah Denton, and Pamela Zorn Adams to bring their cell phones, laptop computers, or personal digital assistants into the courthouse during regular business hours on Friday, September 25, 2015, subject to the following rules contained within this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/23/2015. (jak)
September 4, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice defendant's request for settlement conference, 27 . Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/4/2015. (jak)
March 9, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 9 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/9/2015. (jak)(Docket text modified on 3/9/2015 to correct the description of the document filed). (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortega v. TA Operating LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Ortega
Represented By: Stephen L. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TA Operating LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?