Hawkins et al v. Bank of America NA

Plaintiff: Sheila Hawkins and Tony Hawkins
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Case Number: 3:2013cv00210
Filed: September 20, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing with prejudice the Hawkinses' complaint. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/2/2014. (jak)
February 20, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendant Bank of America to file an answer by 7 March 2014. A final scheduling order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/20/2014. (jak)
January 22, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend; denying without prejudice 18 Motion to file an amended class-action complaint. The Court will withhold entry of Judgment. Plaintiffs may file another proposed amended complaint that atte mpts to satisfy Rule 9 on their ADTPA claim, and that omits class allegations, by 7 February 2014. If no such proposed pleading is filed, or if one is filed that does not pass muster, then the Court will enter judgment dismissing the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/22/2014. (jak)
October 16, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 5 Motion to Dismiss. The original service is quashed. The Court will see if the Hawkinses' prompt efforts to correct the acknowledged deficiencies in the summons and service of process succeed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/16/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins et al v. Bank of America NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Represented By: Diana Borgognoni Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Hawkins
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Christopher D. Jennings
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Annabelle Lee Patterson
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Hawkins
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Christopher D. Jennings
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Annabelle Lee Patterson
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?