Abram v. Allen et al

Plaintiff: Stacy S Abram, IV
Defendant: Arkansas, State of, Mike Allen and Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 3:2013cv00212
Filed: September 26, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion to Set Aside Order. Abram hasn't established any proper basis for Rule 60(b) relief from this Court's recent final Order and related Judgment. Abram's new claims and allegations are beyond the scope of his petition as amended. They are, therefore, not properly before the Court on a post-judgment motion. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/14/2014. (jak)
June 19, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 11 Order, Abram's petition for a writ of habeas corpus is dismissed with prejudice. The 10 Petition is dismissed with prejudice on the non jurisdiction and voluntariness points and otherwise dismissed without prejudice. A certificate of appealability will issue on the jurisdictional defect. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/19/2014. (jak)
September 30, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Mr. Abram to file a request to proceed in forma pauperis with a certificate that meets requirements or pay the $5.00 filing fee to the Court within thirty days of entry of this Order. It is further ordered that Mr. Abram amend his petition to verify that he is currently in custody because of a state court Judgment. He must amend his petition within thirty days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/30/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abram v. Allen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Heil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Heil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy S Abram, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?