Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Faircloth et al

Plaintiff: Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Donald R Faircloth, Jr, Robert Jones, Carolyn Jones and Randall Cohea
Case Number: 3:2013cv00236
Filed: November 4, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for the reasons previously explained, 78 , as supplemented by the sound reasoning of Nationwide's response, 82 , Faircloth's motion for reconsideration, 80 , is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/11/2015. (jak)
August 19, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company is entitled to rescind the non-compulsory provisions of policy No. 6303U017733, which was issued to Donald R. Faircloth, Jr. Faircloth's counter-claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/19/2015. (jak)
May 27, 2015 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Scheduling Order, 37 , is suspended, all deadlines are canceled, and the trial is canceled. Motion, 75 , granted as modified Faircloth's reply due by 29 May 2015. The Court will reset the trial, if need be, after ruling on the cross motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/27/2015. (jak)
May 12, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint motion, 66 , is granted. Randall Cohea individually and as personal representative of the estate of Samantha Cohea, is dismissed without prejudice, and the estate's counterclaim against Nationwide is dismissed without prejudice. All that remains of this case is the dispute between Nationwide and Faircloth. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/12/2015. (jak)
June 6, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 28 Stipulation of Dismissal, all claims against Robert and Carolyn Jones, individually and on behalf of Lillian Jones, are dismissed with prejudice. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/6/2014. (jak)
December 23, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion to Dismiss for the reasons stated, and based on the precedent cited, in Nationwide's 7 Brief. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/23/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Faircloth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kyle Eckert Burton
Represented By: Randy P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald R Faircloth, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Cohea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?